OK SB341 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB341
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Remove as author Senator Holt; authored by Senator Treat
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Remove as author Senator Holt; authored by Senator Treat
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State government; provisions regarding compensation for excess leave. Effective date.
Title
State government; provisions regarding compensation for excess leave. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Holt; authored by Senator Treat |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holt |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB341 (Carry Over) 2017-02-14 - Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author)
Code Citations
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb341&Session=1800 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB341%20INT.PDF |