OK SB338 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB338
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Memorial highways; designating the Lt. Heath Meyer Memorial Highway. Effective date.
Title
Memorial highways; designating the Lt. Heath Meyer Memorial Highway. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Conley (principal House author) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB338 (Carry Over) 2019-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Transportation