OK SB337 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB337
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: House General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: House General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Capitol buildings; providing for display of national motto in the visitor center area of the State Capitol building. Effective date.
Title
Capitol buildings; providing for display of national motto in the visitor center area of the State Capitol building. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2021-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pederson |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB337 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Second Reading referred to General Government