OK SB337 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB337
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mopeds; modifying areas where mopeds are allowed to operate. Effective date.
Title
Mopeds; modifying areas where mopeds are allowed to operate. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Boggs [R] | Rep. Jim Grego [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/07/2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-02 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 9 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2019-04-22 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 12 |
2019-04-18 | House | Amended |
2019-04-18 | House | General Order |
2019-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Grego (principal House author) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boggs |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB337 (Carry Over) 2019-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2019