OK SB331 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - coauthored by West (Josh)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Student athletics; creating the Save Women's Sports Act; requiring designation of certain athletic teams. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student athletics; creating the Save Women's Sports Act; requiring designation of certain athletic teams. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22Senatecoauthored by West (Josh)
2021-02-15Senatecoauthored by Roberts (Sean)
2021-02-10Senatecoauthored by Boles
2021-02-09SenateCoauthored by Representative Townley (principal House author)
2021-02-08SenateCoauthored by Senator Hamilton
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2021-02-01SenateCoauthored by Senator Bullard
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Bergstrom
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback