OK SB331 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-07 - Approved by Governor 04/07/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-07 - Approved by Governor 04/07/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Vehicle License and Registration Act; modifying agency to which certain registration fees are paid. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Vehicle License and Registration Act; modifying agency to which certain registration fees are paid. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/07/2015 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-01 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-03-31 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-03-31 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-31 | House | General Order |
2015-03-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee sub-committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 10 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-02-18 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-02-12 | Senate | coauthored by McCall (principal House author) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |