OK SB331 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Sales tax; relating to sales tax exemptions; replacing amendatory provisions relating to certain aircraft maintenance facility structures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales tax; relating to sales tax exemptions; replacing amendatory provisions relating to certain aircraft maintenance facility structures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House: Revenue and Tax Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-03SenateApproved by Governor 06/03/2014
2014-05-23SenateSent to Governor
2014-05-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2014-05-23SenateEnrolled, to House
2014-05-23SenateReferred for enrollment
2014-05-23HouseTo Senate
2014-05-23HouseMeasure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 21; Ayes: 39 Nays: 27
2014-05-23HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Brumbaugh
2014-05-23HouseCCR adopted
2014-05-21HouseCCR submitted
2014-05-21SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2014-05-21SenateCCR adopted, GCCA
2014-05-21SenateCCR read, GCCA
2014-05-12HouseConference granted, naming GCCA
2014-05-07SenateSCs named GCCA
2014-05-06SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2014-04-22SenateHAs read
2014-04-22HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2014-04-21HouseReferred for engrossment
2014-04-21HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
2014-04-21HouseGeneral Order
2014-04-07HouseEmergency added
2014-04-07HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2014-03-24HouseWithdrawn from Calendar; rereferred to Appropriations and Budget Committee
2013-04-04HouseCR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
2013-03-18HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2013-02-21HouseFirst Reading
2013-02-21SenateEngrossed to House
2013-02-20SenateReferred for engrossment
2013-02-20SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
2013-02-20SenateTitle restored
2013-02-20SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2013-02-12SenateTitle stricken
2013-02-12SenateReported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2013-02-05Senatecoauthored by Sears (principal House author)
2013-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance
2013-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Mazzei
2013-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback