OK SB33 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB33
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Approved by Governor 04/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Approved by Governor 04/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; modifying the 24/7 Tobacco-free Schools Act to prohibit vapor products on certain property. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; modifying the 24/7 Tobacco-free Schools Act to prohibit vapor products on certain property. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/15/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-09 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis |
2019-04-08 | House | General Order |
2019-03-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2019-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Vancuren (principal House author) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dossett |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB33 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Approved by Governor 04/15/2019