OK SB33 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB33
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans; authority to approve certain construction contracts. Effective date.
Title
Veterans; authority to approve certain construction contracts. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2 |
2017-04-17 | House | General Order |
2017-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2017-03-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | coauthored by Hardin (principal House author) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boggs |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB33 (Carry Over) 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017