OK SB326 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB326
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Swine; prohibition import or possession of exotic swine. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Swine; prohibition import or possession of exotic swine. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Suspend Rule (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Suspend Rule (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/31/2017 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-25 | House | To Senate |
2017-05-25 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-25 | House | CCR adopted |
2017-05-23 | House | CCR submitted |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 2 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Rule suspended |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Emergency added |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-05-17 | Senate | CCR read |
2017-05-11 | Senate | SCs changed Smalley, Newberry, Leewright, Bergstrom, Silk, Bass, Sparks to Fields, Boggs, Kidd, Pederson, Simpson, Sparks, Bass |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Smalley; authored by Senator Fields |
2017-05-10 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2017-05-08 | Senate | SCs named Smalley, Newberry, Leewright, Bergstrom, Silk, Bass, Sparks |
2017-05-01 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2017-04-27 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 20; Ayes: 67 Nays: 20 |
2017-04-26 | House | General Order |
2017-04-18 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2017-04-18 | House | Emergency restored |
2017-04-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-03-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 5 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation sub-committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Smalley |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB326 (Carry Over) 2017-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 6 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 70 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 7j | Amended Code | See Bill Text |