OK SB325 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; ATV definitions. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; ATV definitions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-25 | Approved by Governor 04/25/2011 | |
2011-04-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-19 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-04-18 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-18 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-18 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-18 | General Order | |
2011-03-30 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | |
2011-03-24 | Referred to Public Safety Committee | |
2011-03-24 | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-02-28 | First Reading | |
2011-02-28 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-02-24 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-02-24 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2011-02-24 | Title restored | |
2011-02-24 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-02-21 | coauthored by Armes (principal House author) | |
2011-02-21 | Title stricken | |
2011-02-21 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Anderson | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |