OK SB32 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-15 - Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Crimes and punishment; language in regards to earned credits. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and punishment; language in regards to earned credits. Effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-15SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Appropriations
2017-02-09SenateReported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
2017-02-09SenateTitle stricken
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Thompson
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
632401New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback