OK SB318 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/01/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/01/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation and motor vehicles; modifying various sections of the tax code. Effective dates. Emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation and motor vehicles; modifying various sections of the tax code. Effective dates. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-22 - House - House: (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Approved by Governor 06/01/2009 | |
2009-05-22 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-22 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2009-05-22 | Enrolled, to House | |
2009-05-22 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-05-22 | To Senate | |
2009-05-22 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 11 | |
2009-05-22 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ortega, Dorman, Williams, Kouplen | |
2009-05-22 | CCR adopted | |
2009-05-21 | CCR submitted | |
2009-05-21 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1 | |
2009-05-21 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2009-05-21 | coauthored by Dank, Scott, Shelton | |
2009-05-21 | Enacting clause restored | |
2009-05-21 | Title restored | |
2009-05-21 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2009-05-06 | Conference granted, HC's named Hickman, Brannon, Jones, Ownbey, Watson, Pruett, Miller, Martin (Scott) | |
2009-05-04 | SCs named GCCA | |
2009-04-28 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2009-04-23 | HAs read | |
2009-04-23 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-22 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-22 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 17 | |
2009-04-22 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Tibbs, Hilliard, Reynolds, Kern, Enns | |
2009-04-22 | Considered | |
2009-04-21 | Laid over | |
2009-04-21 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McCullough, Derby | |
2009-04-21 | General Order | |
2009-04-13 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2009-04-13 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-03-05 | First Reading | |
2009-03-05 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-04 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8 | |
2009-03-04 | General Order, Amended | |
2009-02-12 | coauthored by Hickman (principal House author) | |
2009-02-12 | coauthored by Gumm, Aldridge, Jolley, Sparks | |
2009-02-12 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-12 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-11 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Hickman | |
2009-02-04 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Gumm | |
2009-02-03 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Jolley, Sparks, Aldridge | |
2009-02-03 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Mazzei | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 563 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 563 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1113 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 1354 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 1356 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 1357 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 1370 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 1370 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 1370 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 1370 | 2A | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 1370 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 1370 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 1370 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 1370 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 1370 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 205 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 205 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 208 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 2357 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2358 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 2358 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2385 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 255 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 265 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 2701 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 2902 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 3624 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 500 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 5011 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 277 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 688 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
85 | 154 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |