OK SB313 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; providing for electronic voter registration; providing procedures. Effective date.
Title
Elections; providing for electronic voter registration; providing procedures. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Banz [R] | Sen. David Holt [R] | Sen. Randy Bass [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/17/2015 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-14 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-13 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 29 |
2015-04-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin |
2015-04-13 | House | General Order |
2015-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-03-31 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee sub-committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2015-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-03-16 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 2 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2015-03-05 | Senate | coauthored by Banz (principal House author) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed |
2015-02-24 | Senate | coauthored by Bass |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holt |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26 | 4 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 4 | 109 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 4 | 110 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 4 | 112 | New Code | See Bill Text |