OK SB310 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; relating to the Oklahoma Health Care Workers and Educators Assistance Program; making award of scholarships contingent on availability of funds. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; relating to the Oklahoma Health Care Workers and Educators Assistance Program; making award of scholarships contingent on availability of funds. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Bass [D] | Sen. Michael Burrage [D] | Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Sen. Earl Garrison [D] |
Sen. Susan Paddack [D] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Approved by Governor 05/11/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-05 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2009-05-05 | Enrolled, to House | |
2009-05-04 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-05-04 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2009-05-04 | coauthored by Pittman | |
2009-05-04 | coauthored by Burrage, Garrison, Bass | |
2009-05-04 | HAs adopted | |
2009-04-22 | HAs read | |
2009-04-22 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-21 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 5 | |
2009-04-21 | General Order | |
2009-04-13 | Title restored | |
2009-04-13 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-02-26 | First Reading | |
2009-02-26 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-02-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-02-25 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2009-02-25 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-16 | coauthored by Cox (principal House author) | |
2009-02-16 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-16 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-12 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-04 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Cox | |
2009-02-04 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Education sub-committee | |
2009-02-03 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Education | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Paddack | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |