OK SB299 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-17 - Approved by Governor 05/17/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-17 - Approved by Governor 05/17/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Chiropractors; providing for certain investigations. Effective date.
Title
Chiropractors; providing for certain investigations. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. John Enns [R] | Sen. Clark Jolley [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-17 | Approved by Governor 05/17/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-11 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-05-11 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-05-10 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-10 | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-10 | HAs adopted | |
2011-04-25 | HAs read | |
2011-04-25 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-21 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 24 | |
2011-04-21 | General Order | |
2011-03-31 | Title restored | |
2011-03-31 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | |
2011-03-08 | First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-07 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-07 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by Enns (principal House author) | |
2011-02-28 | Title stricken | |
2011-02-28 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-02-14 | Withdrawn from Health and Human Services committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Jolley | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |