OK SB287 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB287
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Oil and gas; authorizing DEQ and Corporation Commission to administer oil and gas programs. Effective date.
Title
Oil and gas; authorizing DEQ and Corporation Commission to administer oil and gas programs. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/26/2017 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 6 |
2017-04-19 | House | General Order |
2017-04-03 | House | CR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2017-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 8 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Watson (principal House author) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Griffin |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB287 (Carry Over) 2017-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2017