OK SB285 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB285
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Approved by Governor 05/19/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Approved by Governor 05/19/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Labor; requiring state agency to allow paid break time under certain circumstances. Effective date.
Title
Labor; requiring state agency to allow paid break time under certain circumstances. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Carol Bush [R] | Rep. Cynthia Roe [R] | Sen. Julia Kirt [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-19 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/19/2020 |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-13 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-12 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 12 |
2020-05-12 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Kirt |
2020-05-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roe |
2020-05-12 | House | General Order |
2020-05-06 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2020-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Title restored |
2020-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Dossett; authored by Senator David |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dossett |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB285 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee