OK SB285 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB285
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Corporation Commission; Oklahoma Brine and Produced Water Development Act.
Title
Corporation Commission; Oklahoma Brine and Produced Water Development Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 1 |
2017-04-26 | House | General Order |
2017-04-13 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2017-04-13 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2017-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Schulz |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB285 (Carry Over) 2017-04-27 - HAs read