OK SB283 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB283
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-12 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-12 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Building Code Commission; powers and duties; training and programs; codes and standards; creating fund. Effective date.
Title
Uniform Building Code Commission; powers and duties; training and programs; codes and standards; creating fund. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-03-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osburn (Mike) (principal House author) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newberry |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB283 (Carry Over) 2017-04-12 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 14 | 104 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1000 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1000 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |