OK SB283 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Coauthored by Brecheen
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Coauthored by Brecheen
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Government; relating to funding the Oklahoma Art in Public Places Act.
Title
Government; relating to funding the Oklahoma Art in Public Places Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Brecheen |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Brecheen; authored by Shortey |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brecheen |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb283&Session=1600 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB283%20INT.PDF |