OK SB283 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
School employees; directing the State Board of Education to be notified upon the filing or adjudication of certain charges. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
School employees; directing the State Board of Education to be notified upon the filing or adjudication of certain charges. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/13/2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2013-04-24 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-23 | House | General Order |
2013-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2013-02-28 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 7 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-02-27 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Thomsen (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brecheen |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 5 | 144 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |