OK SB280 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
An act relating to online education; removing requirement for telephonic communication between teacher and parents. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
An act relating to online education; removing requirement for telephonic communication between teacher and parents. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - House - House: RECONSIDER (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - House: (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: Conference Committee on Education: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 55 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - House: (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: Conference Committee on Education: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 55 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Approved by Governor 05/26/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-05-19 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-19 | To Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-19 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1 | |
2011-05-19 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Coody | |
2011-05-19 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 33 | |
2011-05-19 | Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 3 | |
2011-05-19 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-17 | CCR submitted | |
2011-05-17 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-17 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-16 | Emergency added | |
2011-05-16 | CCR read | |
2011-05-09 | SCs named Stanislawski, Ford, Brinkley, David, Eason McIntyre, Garrison | |
2011-05-05 | Conference granted, naming: Conference Committee on Education | |
2011-05-03 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2011-04-20 | HAs read | |
2011-04-20 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-19 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 27; Ayes: 55 Nays: 29 | |
2011-04-19 | Amended | |
2011-04-19 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze | |
2011-04-19 | General Order | |
2011-04-06 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2011-03-01 | First Reading | |
2011-03-01 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-02-28 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-02-28 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | |
2011-02-28 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-02-15 | coauthored by Coody (principal House author) | |
2011-02-15 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Stanislawski | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |