OK SB272 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB272
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Outstanding fines and fees; directing automatic deferral of certain fines, fees and court costs. Effective date.
Title
Outstanding fines and fees; directing automatic deferral of certain fines, fees and court costs. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2017-02-08 | Senate | coauthored by Biggs (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB272 (Carry Over) 2017-02-21 - Title stricken