OK SB271 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB271
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; imposing on state agencies certain requirements for disclosure of information. Effective date.
Title
Public finance; imposing on state agencies certain requirements for disclosure of information. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/29/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 9 |
2019-04-23 | House | General Order |
2019-04-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Chad) |
2019-04-03 | House | CR; Do Pass Government Efficiency Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Efficiency |
2019-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 13 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB271 (Carry Over) 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019