OK SB269 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB269
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
School district boards of education; allowing a board to enter into a multi-year contract with principals and vice principals.
Title
School district boards of education; allowing a board to enter into a multi-year contract with principals and vice principals.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Sharp [R] | Rep. Dell Kerbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-04 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kerbs (principal House author) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sharp |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB269 (Carry Over) 2019-03-20 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee