OK SB268 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; requiring district board of education to implement alternative governance arrangements in accordance with federal law.
Title
Schools; requiring district board of education to implement alternative governance arrangements in accordance with federal law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-16 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 53 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2009-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Approved by Governor 05/13/2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-07 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2009-05-07 | Enrolled, to House | |
2009-05-06 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-05-06 | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 7 | |
2009-05-06 | HAs adopted | |
2009-04-20 | HAs read | |
2009-04-20 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-16 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 37; Ayes: 53 Nays: 37 | |
2009-04-16 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2009-04-16 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hickman | |
2009-04-16 | General Order | |
2009-04-09 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2009-03-04 | First Reading | |
2009-03-04 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-03 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 4 | |
2009-03-03 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-25 | General Order, considered and deferred | |
2009-02-17 | coauthored by Sears (principal House author) | |
2009-02-17 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-16 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-04 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Sears | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Ford | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1210 | 543 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 544 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |