OK SB265 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB265
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sales tax; exempting sales to city-county libraries. Effective date.
Title
Sales tax; exempting sales to city-county libraries. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/28/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-21 | House | General Order |
2021-04-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron |
2021-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 4 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Nichols (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Matthews |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB265 (Carry Over) 2021-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2021