OK SB260 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools, extending requirement to provide full-day kindergarten by two years.
Title
Schools, extending requirement to provide full-day kindergarten by two years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - House - House: (Y: 76 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 29 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 48 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 52 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House: : (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 29 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 48 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 52 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House: : (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Approved by Governor 05/25/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-05-20 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-20 | To Senate | |
2011-05-20 | Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 17 | |
2011-05-20 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2011-05-20 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2011-05-20 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-20 | coauthored by Garrison | |
2011-05-20 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2011-05-19 | 2 CCR read | |
2011-05-19 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2011-05-19 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2011-05-17 | CCR submitted | |
2011-05-17 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 29 Nays: 12 | |
2011-05-17 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-16 | Enacting clause restored | |
2011-05-16 | Title restored | |
2011-05-16 | CCR read | |
2011-05-11 | Conference granted, naming GCCA | |
2011-05-10 | SCs named Ford, Stanislawski, Halligan, Jolley, Eason McIntyre, Rice | |
2011-05-10 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2011-04-26 | HAs read | |
2011-04-26 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-25 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 42; Ayes: 48 Nays: 33 | |
2011-04-25 | Laid over | |
2011-04-25 | Amended | |
2011-04-25 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Stanislawski | |
2011-04-25 | General Order | |
2011-04-14 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2011-04-14 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-04-14 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Stanislawski | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-03-15 | First Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-14 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 13 | |
2011-03-14 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2011-03-07 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-02-22 | coauthored by Denney (principal House author) | |
2011-02-22 | Title stricken | |
2011-02-22 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Ford | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 18 | 108 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 132 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 134 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 136 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 142 | New Code | See Bill Text |
sb981 | New Code | See Bill Text |