OK SB26 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB26

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; amending the definition of bus. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; amending the definition of bus. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 15 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26SenateApproved by Governor 04/26/2017
2017-04-20SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-20HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2017-04-20SenateEnrolled, to House
2017-04-19SenateReferred for enrollment
2017-04-19HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2017-04-19HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 3
2017-04-19HouseGeneral Order
2017-04-10HouseCR; Do Pass Transportation Committee
2017-03-27HouseSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2017-03-20HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-15SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-14SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8
2017-03-14SenateMotion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2017-03-08SenateNotice served to reconsider vote on measure Allen
2017-03-08SenateMeasure failed: Ayes: 15 Nays: 24
2017-03-08SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2017-02-20SenateCoauthored by Representative Vaughan (principal House author)
2017-02-14SenateReported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Allen
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB26 (Carry Over) 2017-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2017

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
471105New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback