OK SB252 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-17 - Approved by Governor 05/17/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-17 - Approved by Governor 05/17/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
An act relating to school employment; requiring schools to reimburse cost of criminal history checks; requiring schools to transfer completed checks; modifying frequency of criminal history checks. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
An act relating to school employment; requiring schools to reimburse cost of criminal history checks; requiring schools to transfer completed checks; modifying frequency of criminal history checks. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-17 | Approved by Governor 05/17/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-11 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-05-11 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-05-10 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-10 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-10 | HAs adopted | |
2011-04-20 | HAs read | |
2011-04-20 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-19 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-19 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze, Condit | |
2011-04-19 | General Order | |
2011-04-07 | Title restored | |
2011-04-07 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-03-16 | First Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-15 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-15 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-02-16 | coauthored by Holland (principal House author) | |
2011-02-16 | Title stricken | |
2011-02-16 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Fields | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |