OK SB250 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Office of the Chief Medical Examiner; modifying various provisions related to the office. Codification. Noncodification. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of the Chief Medical Examiner; modifying various provisions related to the office. Codification. Noncodification. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-18 - House - House: (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-25 Approved by Governor 05/25/2011
2011-05-19 Sent to Governor
2011-05-19 Signed, returned to Senate
2011-05-19 Enrolled, to House
2011-05-18 Referred for enrollment
2011-05-18 To Senate
2011-05-18 Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
2011-05-18 Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin), Sanders
2011-05-18 CCR adopted
2011-05-17 CCR submitted
2011-05-17 Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2011-05-17 CCR adopted, GCCA
2011-05-16 Title restored
2011-05-16 CCR read, GCCA
2011-05-09 SCs named GCCA
2011-05-09 Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs
2011-05-05 HAs rejected, conference requested
2011-05-02 HAs read
2011-05-02 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2011-04-27 Referred for engrossment
2011-04-27 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
2011-04-27 Title stricken
2011-04-27 Amended
2011-04-27 Coauthored by Representative(s) McAffrey, Tibbs, Cox, Condit, Ritze, Scott, Sherrer, Roan, Hoskin
2011-04-27 General Order
2011-04-13 Title restored
2011-04-13 Coauthored by Representative(s) Hilliard, Cockroft
2011-04-13 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
2011-03-17 Second Reading referred to Public Safety
2011-03-16 First Reading
2011-03-16 Engrossed to House
2011-03-15 Referred for engrossment
2011-03-15 Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2011-03-15 coauthored by Billy
2011-03-15 coauthored by Shortey, Brinkley, David
2011-03-15 General Order, Considered
2011-03-07 coauthored by Paddack
2011-03-07 Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2011-02-23 Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee
2011-02-23 Referred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services
2011-02-17 Referred to Appropriations
2011-02-17 Title stricken
2011-02-17 coauthored by Ballenger, Garrison, Johnson (Constance)
2011-02-17 Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
2011-02-08 Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2011-02-07 coauthored by Armes (principal House author)
2011-02-07 Authored by Senator Marlatt
2011-02-07 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
63931New CodeSee Bill Text
63934New CodeSee Bill Text
63935New CodeSee Bill Text
63938New CodeSee Bill Text
63940New CodeSee Bill Text
63942New CodeSee Bill Text
63942aAmended CodeSee Bill Text
63944New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback