OK SB241 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-02 - Vetoed 05/02/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-02 - Vetoed 05/02/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
County roads and bridges; modifying certain payment procedures.
Title
County roads and bridges; modifying certain payment procedures.
Sponsors
Sen. Cliff Branan [R] | Rep. Paul Roan [D] | Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Rep. Mike Sanders [R] |
Rep. Purcy Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-25 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 55 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Vetoed 05/02/2011 | |
2011-05-02 | Veto message read | |
2011-04-26 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-26 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-04-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-25 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-25 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0; Ayes: 55 Nays: 29 | |
2011-04-25 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Walker, Roberts (Dustin), Roan | |
2011-04-25 | General Order | |
2011-04-07 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-03-16 | First Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-15 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-15 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-24 | coauthored by Sanders (principal House author) | |
2011-02-24 | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Branan | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |