OK SB238 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB238
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; creating a task force to study a requirement for high school students to complete the FAFSA. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; creating a task force to study a requirement for high school students to complete the FAFSA. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 24 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | House | Motion expired |
2021-04-12 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Nollan |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 24 Nays: 73 |
2021-04-12 | House | General Order |
2021-03-30 | House | CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech |
2021-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Nollan (principal House author) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pemberton |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB238 (Carry Over) 2021-04-14 - Motion expired