OK SB238 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Drugs, devices and cosmetics; creating certain labeling requirements for cannabidiol. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drugs, devices and cosmetics; creating certain labeling requirements for cannabidiol. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by Governor 05/13/2019
2019-05-07SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-07HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-07SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-06SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-06SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
2019-05-06SenateHAs adopted
2019-04-24SenateHAs read
2019-04-24HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-23HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-23HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 1
2019-04-23HouseAmended
2019-04-23HouseHouse Rule suspended
2019-04-23HouseConsidered
2019-04-23HouseLaid over
2019-04-23HouseAmended
2019-04-23HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-09HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-03-07HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-07SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-06SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-06SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
2019-03-06SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-03-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Allen
2019-02-27SenateCoauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author)
2019-02-11SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Standridge
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb238&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB238%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB238%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB238%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB238%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB238%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB238%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB238%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB238_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB238_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback