OK SB235 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB235
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sales tax; clarifying application of certain exemption; extending exemption to certain contractors; requiring certification. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Sales tax; clarifying application of certain exemption; extending exemption to certain contractors; requiring certification. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/16/2017 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-10 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2017-04-25 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-24 | House | General Order |
2017-04-18 | House | Emergency restored |
2017-04-18 | House | Title restored |
2017-04-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-04-06 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-03-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Leewright |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB235 (Carry Over) 2017-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2017