OK SB233 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Court costs; requiring payment of court costs at the time of filing of certain actions. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Court costs; requiring payment of court costs at the time of filing of certain actions. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary
2019-05-02SenateSCs named Thompson, Daniels, Howard, Weaver, Brooks, Floyd
2019-04-30SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2019-04-22SenateHAs read
2019-04-18HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-17HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-17HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0
2019-04-17HouseGeneral Order
2019-03-27HouseEnacting clause stricken
2019-03-27HouseTitle stricken
2019-03-27HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-03-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-13SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2019-03-12SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-03-11SenateCoauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author)
2019-02-26SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Thompson
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback