OK SB232 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Healthier neighborhood living; creating the Task Force on Healthier Neighborhood Living.
Title
Healthier neighborhood living; creating the Task Force on Healthier Neighborhood Living.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Armes [R] | Sen. Constance Johnson [D] | Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Rep. Steve Vaughan [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Government Modernization: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 56 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: RECONSIDER (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Government Modernization: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 56 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: RECONSIDER (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | CCR submitted | |
2011-05-19 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 4 | |
2011-05-19 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2011-05-17 | Title restored | |
2011-05-17 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2011-05-09 | SCs named GCCA | |
2011-05-09 | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization and Rules | |
2011-05-05 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2011-04-26 | HAs read | |
2011-04-26 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-25 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 2; Ayes: 56 Nays: 21 | |
2011-04-25 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Vaughan | |
2011-04-25 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 70 Nays: 3 | |
2011-04-20 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Armes | |
2011-04-20 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 47 | |
2011-04-20 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman | |
2011-04-20 | General Order | |
2011-04-07 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-03-15 | First Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-14 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-14 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2011-03-14 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by Armes (principal House author) | |
2011-02-28 | Title stricken | |
2011-02-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-02-14 | Withdrawn from Health and Human Services committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Marlatt | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |