OK SB232 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/01/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/01/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State employees; modifying methodology for accrual of leave; deleting restriction. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
State employees; modifying methodology for accrual of leave; deleting restriction. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-22 - House - House: (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Approved by Governor 06/01/2009 | |
2009-05-22 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-22 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2009-05-22 | Enrolled, to House | |
2009-05-22 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-05-22 | To Senate | |
2009-05-22 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 | |
2009-05-22 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2009-05-20 | CCR submitted, GCCA | |
2009-05-20 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2009-05-20 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2009-05-20 | Enacting clause restored | |
2009-05-20 | Title restored | |
2009-05-20 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2009-05-06 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2009-05-05 | HAs rejected, conference requested, GCCA | |
2009-04-23 | HAs read | |
2009-04-23 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-22 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-22 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 3 | |
2009-04-22 | General Order | |
2009-04-07 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2009-04-07 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-03-04 | First Reading | |
2009-03-04 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-03 | Measure passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-03 | Title stricken | |
2009-03-03 | General Order, Amended | |
2009-02-09 | Direct to Calendar | |
2009-02-02 | coauthored by Miller, Martin (Scott) (principal House author) | |
2009-02-02 | coauthored by Myers | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Mike) | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 840 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 840 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |