OK SB227 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Federally qualified health centers; requiring State Department of Health to develop system for public comment. Effective date.
Title
Federally qualified health centers; requiring State Department of Health to develop system for public comment. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2015-02-26 | Senate | coauthored by Derby (principal House author) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |