OK SB216 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Creating Task Force on the Collection, Distribution and Enforcement of Municipal Sales Tax; providing for purpose, appointment of members and related procedures; requiring Oklahoma Tax Commission to provide information; requiring final report. Noncodification. Effective date.
Title
Creating Task Force on the Collection, Distribution and Enforcement of Municipal Sales Tax; providing for purpose, appointment of members and related procedures; requiring Oklahoma Tax Commission to provide information; requiring final report. Noncodification. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 48 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 48 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | Approved by Governor 05/13/2011 | |
2011-05-09 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-09 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-05-09 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-05-05 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-05 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-05 | HAs adopted | |
2011-04-20 | HAs read | |
2011-04-20 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-19 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 2; Ayes: 48 Nays: 27 | |
2011-04-19 | General Order | |
2011-04-14 | Title restored | |
2011-04-14 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-03-15 | First Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-14 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-14 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-07 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-07 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to Finance | |
2011-02-22 | coauthored by Peters (principal House author) | |
2011-02-22 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Finance Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Paddack | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |