OK SB2151 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Drug courts; authorizing judge to enter certain order, with restrictions. Effective date.
Title
Drug courts; authorizing judge to enter certain order, with restrictions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. John Carey [D] | Sen. Jay Gumm [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-25 | First Reading | |
2010-02-25 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-02-24 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-24 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2010-02-24 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-24 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-02-10 | coauthored by Carey (principal House author) | |
2010-02-10 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-09 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-09 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Carey | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Gumm | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |