OK SB2131 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

State employee compensation; providing for salary increases for certain state employees. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State employee compensation; providing for salary increases for certain state employees. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 18 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 37) [FAIL]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-03SenateApproved by Governor 06/03/2014
2014-05-23SenateSent to Governor
2014-05-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2014-05-23SenateEnrolled, to House
2014-05-23SenateReferred for enrollment
2014-05-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2014-05-23HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
2014-05-23HouseJCR adopted
2014-05-23HouseGeneral Order
2014-05-22HouseSecond Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
2014-05-21HouseFirst Reading
2014-05-21SenateEngrossed to House
2014-05-21Senatecoauthored by Marlatt, Shortey
2014-05-21Senatecoauthored by Billy
2014-05-21SenateReferred for engrossment
2014-05-21SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
2014-05-21SenateJCR adopted
2014-05-19SenateEmergency added
2014-05-19SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed
2014-05-19Senatecoauthored by Condit, Matthews
2014-05-12SenateSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2014-05-08Senatecoauthored by Sears
2014-05-08Senatecoauthored by Martin (Scott) (principal House author)
2014-05-08Senatecoauthored by Justice
2014-05-08SenateAuthored by Senator Jolley
2014-05-08SenateFirst Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback