OK SB2115 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Vetoed 05/23/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Vetoed 05/23/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Pardon and Parole Board; authorizing certain compensation of the Chair and members of the Board for certain purpose. Effective date.
Title
Pardon and Parole Board; authorizing certain compensation of the Chair and members of the Board for certain purpose. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Senate | Vetoed 05/23/2014 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-19 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2014-04-16 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 2 |
2014-04-15 | House | General Order |
2014-04-07 | House | Title restored |
2014-04-07 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Johnson (Constance) |
2014-04-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze |
2014-04-07 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee |
2014-02-12 | Senate | coauthored by Newell (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brecheen |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |