OK SB2102 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Tibbs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Tibbs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Counties and county officers; prohibiting action against certain official under specified circumstances. Effective date.
Title
Counties and county officers; prohibiting action against certain official under specified circumstances. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Bailey [D] | Sen. Jerry Ellis [D] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Tibbs | |
2010-03-30 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2010-02-23 | First Reading | |
2010-02-23 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-02-22 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-22 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-02-22 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-10 | coauthored by Bailey (principal House author) | |
2010-02-10 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-09 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Bailey | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Ellis | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |