OK SB21 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Definitions and general provisions; designating the ribeye steak as the official state steak. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Definitions and general provisions; designating the ribeye steak as the official state steak. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - House - House: Tourism Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateApproved by Governor 05/02/2019
2019-04-29SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-29HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-29SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-04-25SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-04-25HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-25HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 2
2019-04-25HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Grego
2019-04-25HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-04HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Burns, Hilbert
2019-04-04HouseCR; Do Pass Tourism Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Tourism
2019-02-21HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-21SenateEngrossed to House
2019-02-20SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-02-20SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 7
2019-02-20SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-02-14SenateCoauthored by Representative Caldwell (Trey) (principal House author)
2019-02-14SenateReported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Murdock
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback