OK SB21 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; providing definition of "Tillerman". Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; providing definition of "Tillerman". Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-24SenateApproved by Governor 04/24/2017
2017-04-18SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-18HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2017-04-18SenateEnrolled, to House
2017-04-17SenateReferred for enrollment
2017-04-13HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2017-04-13HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
2017-04-13HouseGeneral Order
2017-04-03HouseCR; Do Pass Transportation Committee
2017-03-27HouseSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2017-02-22HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-22SenateEngrossed to House
2017-02-21SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-02-21SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 3
2017-02-21SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2017-02-16SenateCoauthored by Representative Vaughan (principal House author)
2017-02-14SenateReported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Allen
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
471108Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback