OK SB21 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - coauthored by Coody (Jeff)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; creating the Religious Viewpoints Anti-discrimination Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; creating the Religious Viewpoints Anti-discrimination Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-24Senatecoauthored by Coody (Jeff)
2015-02-24SenateEmergency clause stricken
2015-02-24SenateTitle stricken
2015-02-24SenateReported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
2015-02-23Senatecoauthored by Park
2015-02-18Senatecoauthored by Fisher, Kern, Russ, Ritze
2015-02-18Senatecoauthored by Bennett (principal House author)
2015-02-03SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2015-02-02SenateAuthored by Senator Allen
2015-02-02SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7027201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7027202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7027203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7027204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7027205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7027206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7027207Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7027208Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback