OK SB21 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Income tax refunds; providing for donation from income tax refund for music festivals in Historic Greenwood District; creating revolving fund. Codification. Effective date.
Title
Income tax refunds; providing for donation from income tax refund for music festivals in Historic Greenwood District; creating revolving fund. Codification. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Title restored | |
2011-04-14 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-03-14 | First Reading | |
2011-03-14 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-10 | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 7 | |
2011-03-10 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-07 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-07 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to Finance | |
2011-02-15 | coauthored by Shumate (principal House author) | |
2011-02-15 | Reported Do Pass Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife Committee then to Finance Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Eason McIntyre | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |