OK SB201 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Debts resulting from motor vehicle violations; authorizing cities, counties and Department of Public Safety to place hold on motor vehicle registration due to delinquent payment of fines or penalties; authorizing motor license agents to accept certain payments.
Title
Debts resulting from motor vehicle violations; authorizing cities, counties and Department of Public Safety to place hold on motor vehicle registration due to delinquent payment of fines or penalties; authorizing motor license agents to accept certain payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: CONFEREES ARE UNABLE TO AGREE (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 50 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House: RECONSIDER (Y: 57 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House: R (Y: 12 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 42) [FAIL]
2011-04-27 - House - House: AMENDMENT (Y: 15 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2011-04-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 50 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House: RECONSIDER (Y: 57 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House: R (Y: 12 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 42) [FAIL]
2011-04-27 - House - House: AMENDMENT (Y: 15 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2011-04-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Conferees unable to agree | |
2011-05-18 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2011-05-18 | SCs named Aldridge, Mazzei, Holt, Brown, Sparks, Burrage | |
2011-05-18 | Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference | |
2011-05-18 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, GCCA | |
2011-05-18 | Considered and deferred | |
2011-05-17 | Title restored | |
2011-05-17 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2011-05-05 | SCs named GCCA | |
2011-05-05 | Conference granted, naming: Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs | |
2011-05-03 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2011-05-02 | HAs read | |
2011-05-02 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-27 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-27 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 35 | |
2011-04-27 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 57 Nays: 23 | |
2011-04-27 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Nelson | |
2011-04-27 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 50 Nays: 44 | |
2011-04-27 | Amended | |
2011-04-27 | General Order | |
2011-04-12 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2011-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-03-16 | First Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-15 | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 11 | |
2011-03-15 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-01 | coauthored by Nelson (principal House author) | |
2011-03-01 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-01 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Aldridge | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 14 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 863 | 13A | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 983 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
26 | 5 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1106 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 1115 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 1140 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 1141 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1143 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2913 | New Code | See Bill Text |